CLARK et al v. NOVO NORDISK et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03826 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Plaintiff
BRIDGET CLARK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANCIS CLARK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/06 4:08 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK, NOVO NORDISK A/S. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/6/24. (mbh) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/06 1:31 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3826. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/05 7:21 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK, NOVO NORDISK A/S ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17651622.), filed by FRANCIS CLARK, BRIDGET CLARK.(Silverman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |