STARKS v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03869 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
YVONNE STARKS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/07 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/7/2024 (sg) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/07 10:53 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3869. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
57
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/06 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17653825.), filed by YVONNE STARKS.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |