JENSEN v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03891 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER B JENSEN
34965 Cherry St
Wildomar, CA 92595 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 8:07 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/07 1:28 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case.. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3891. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/06 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17654853.), filed by CHRISTOPHER B JENSEN.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |