LAMPREY v. NOVO NORDISK INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03895 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 6:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC
|
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS LAMPREY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler on behalf of THOMAS LAMPREY (Pfeifler, Hannah) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/07 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: Debra Nicole Guntner on 8/7/24 (fdc) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/07 1:53 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3895. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
57
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/06 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17654973.), filed by THOMAS LAMPREY.(GUNTNER, DEBRA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |