NELSON v. NOVO NORDISK INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03958 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 4:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN NELSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler on behalf of KAREN NELSON (Pfeifler, Hannah) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/8/24 (dt) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/08 8:54 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case. EDPA. Case number in EDPA: 24cv3958 (nd) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
57
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 08/07 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17657799.), filed by KAREN NELSON.(GUNTNER, DEBRA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |