BLACKBURN v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04016 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 1:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS L BLACKBURN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/8/24 (dt) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/08 11:03 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4016. (sbt) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 08/07 9:00 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17658525.), filed by NICHOLAS L BLACKBURN.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |