MALLETT v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04034 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
LILLY CORPORATE CENTER
INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46285 |
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
QUANEKA MALLETT
129A Fairfax Street
Brandon, MS 39047 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/8/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/08 11:33 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4034. (sbt) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 08/08 12:01 AM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17658588.), filed by QUANEKA MALLETT.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |