HURTER v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04201 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 14, 2024 3:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
893 S. Delaware St.
Indianapolis, IN 46225 |
|
Plaintiff
MICHELLE HURTER
11 County Road 679
Hanceville, AL 35077 |
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 09/03 2:19 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4201. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/15 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 08/14 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17674107.), filed by MICHELLE HURTER.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |