Villecco v. Barela, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-02403
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01320 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 4:28 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH M. BARELA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP E. SPESSHARDT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL VILLECCO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 05 2024
[11118327] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [24-1320] |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 4:28 AM MDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
[11112057] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/09/2024. Notice of appearance due on 08/27/2024 for Joseph M. Barela and Philip E. Spesshardt and on 09/12/2024 for Michael Villecco. 24-1320 | ||
Att: 1 20 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas | ||
2 pgs [11112115] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - On or before August 27, 2024, Mr. Villecco shall show cause in writing why he should not be required to prepay the $605 appellate filing fee. Alternatively, Mr. Villecco may prepay the $605 appellate filing fee to the district court. Served on 08/13/2024. (Written order attached.) 24-1320 |