CRUMPTON v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04230 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN CRUMPTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/16 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/16/2024. (ahf) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 08/16 9:41 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4230. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 08/15 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17676835.), filed by SUSAN CRUMPTON.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |