RASMUSSEN v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04326 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
LISA RASMUSSEN
3632 Perlino Dr
Murfreesboro, TN 37128 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/20/24. (mbh) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/20 10:08 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4326. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/19 7:41 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17683716.), filed by LISA RASMUSSEN.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |