BRATCHER v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04341 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 4:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
DIANA BRATCHER
441 Wingfiels Church Rd
Bowling Green, KY 42101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/21 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/21/2024. (ahf) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/20 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17686551.), filed by DIANA BRATCHER.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/20 4:48 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4341. (sbt) |