TODD v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04351 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JODIE TODD
2661 Dylan Dr.
Pea Ridge, AR 72751 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/21 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/21/2024. (ahf) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/21 10:26 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4351. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
56
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/20 6:47 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17687311.), filed by JODIE TODD.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |