HONOR v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04369 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JUANITA HONOR
9714 Magnolia view Ct apt 513
Riverview, FL 33578 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/22 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/22/2024. (ahf) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 08/22 10:43 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4369. (sbt) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 08/21 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17689548.), filed by JUANITA HONOR.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |