Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12410

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-bk-12412
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roti Restaurants Inc.
445 N. Wells Street Suite 404
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Michael P Richman
Richman & Richman LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 order Generic Order Wed 02/26 2:23 PM
Order - An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of Roti Restaurants Inc. to R86 Restaurants Inc. Signed on 2/25/2025 (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
26 26 9 pgs misc List of Equity Security Holders Tue 09/10 8:06 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) Tue 09/10 6:49 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 8 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107/207) Tue 09/10 6:48 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs misc List of Equity Security Holders Tue 09/10 6:47 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum/206Sum) Tue 09/10 6:46 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 18 pgs misc Schedules Tue 09/10 6:45 PM
Schedules A / B,D,E / F,G,H,with Declaration Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sun 09/01 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case
Friday, August 30, 2024
19 19 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 08/30 9:23 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear by Teams. Last day to object to dischargeability is 11/25/2024. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Deficiency Wed 08/28 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Deficiency Chapter 11
17 17 3 pgs order Joint Administration Wed 08/28 3:03 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 - Roti Restaurants LLC with Member Cases(s) 24-12412 - Roti Restaurants Inc., 24-12422 - ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC, 24-12415 ROTI 1311 F Street LLC, 24-12416 ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC, 24-12418 ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Avenue LLC, 24-12427 ROTI Constitution Square LLC, 24-12428 -ROTI Square 54, LLC, 24-12425 ROTI 3 North Dearborn LLC Related [+]. Signed on 8/28/2024. (Armstead, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
16 16 1 pgs trustee Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Tue 08/27 6:40 PM
Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng Related [+]. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-] 15 Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
15 15 trustee Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 08/27 6:39 PM
Notice of Appointment of Ira Bodenstein as Subchapter V Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
14 14 17 pgs motion Joint Administration Mon 08/26 8:26 PM
Notice of Motion and Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 In re: Roti Restaurants, LLC with Member Case(s) 24-12412 In re: Roti Restaurants Inc.; 24-12415 In re: ROTI 1311 F Street, LLC; 24-12416 In re: ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC; 24-12418 In re: ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Ave LLC; 24-12422 In re: ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC; 24-12425 In re: ROTI 33 North Dearborn, LLC; 24-12427 In re: ROTI Constitution Square, LLC; 24-12428 In re: ROTI Square 54, LLC Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 court Reassignment of Related Case Local Rule 1015 Mon 08/26 10:31 AM
Per Local Rule 1015-1 case related to case number 24-12410 and therefore reassigned from Judge Janet S. Baer to Judge Donald R Cassling. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 12 Certification of Relatedness
12 12 2 pgs misc Certification of Relatedness Mon 08/26 10:04 AM
Certification of Relatedness Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs misc Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Mon 08/26 10:04 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc. Related [+]. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
10 10 1 pgs court Notice of Deficiency Chapter 11 (Case Opening Only) Mon 08/26 9:29 AM
Notice of Deficiency given to Debtor(s) that the following document(s) were due at the time of filing and are deficient: Certification of Relatedness (applicable to related cases). Signature(s) of Debtor(s) are missing from the Voluntary Petition. Please file the signature page(s) as an Attachment to the Voluntary Petition. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
9 9 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 08/26 9:28 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: To correct docket text. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:12 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:12 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:11 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:10 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:09 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Tax Documents Fri 08/23 6:08 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc.. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 08/23 6:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12412 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48311034. Fee Amount $1738.00 (Richman, Michael) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a) Fri 08/23 5:03 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Restaurants Inc. Chapter 11 SubchapterV Plan due by 11/21/2024. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]