Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-bk-12410
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roti Restaurants, LLC
445 N. Wells Street Suite 404
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Michael P Richman
Richman & Richman LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
563 563 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 04/23 10:02 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF Error, Filer to Refile Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 561 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
564 564 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 04/23 11:53 AM
Order Confirming Non-Consensual Subchapter V Chapter 11 Plan Related [+]. Signed on 4/22/2025 (Miller, Marvin)
Related: [-] 508 Chapter 11 Small Business Plan/Amended Small Business Plan (Form 425A)
562 562 order Compensation Wed 04/23 8:14 AM
First Interim Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Much Shelist, P.C,, fees awarded: $412602.00, expenses awarded: $1780.47. Signed on 4/22/2025. (O'Neal, Michelle)
Related: [-] 536
561 561 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/22 5:09 PM
Proposed Order - ORDER GRANTING FIRST INTERIM APPLICATION OF MUCH SHELIST, P.C. AS SPECIAL COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS FOR THE PERIOD AUGUST 23, 2024 THROUGH MARCH 15, 2025 Filed by Robert W Glantz on behalf of Much Shelist, P.C, Related [+]. (Glantz, Robert)
Related: [-] 536 Application for Compensation
560 560 order Generic Order Tue 04/22 12:31 PM
Order Conditionally Approving Payment Of March 2025 Invoice Of Richman & Richman LLC Pursuant To The Order Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation AndReimbursement, Debtor Attorney, Fees Awarded $19,551.20, Expenses awarded:$5,408.95 Awarded on 04/22/2025 Related [+]. Signed on 4/22/2025 (Miller, Marvin)
Related: [-] 220 Order on for Motion Interim Fee and Expense Reimbursement Procedure
559 559 court Confirmation Hearing Continued Tue 04/22 12:23 PM
POST Confirmation Hearing Continued . POST Confirmation hearing to be held on 7/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-]
558 558 order Leave Tue 04/22 12:00 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Leave Related [+] (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 553
557 557 utility U - Draft Order Tue 04/22 12:00 PM
Draft Order Related [+]. due by 05/06/2025 (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] #:536 Compensation WITH Notice of Motion
556 556 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/22 11:10 AM
Proposed Order - Order Confirming Non-Consensual Subchapter V Plan Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of R86 Liquidation Related [+]. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-] 508 Chapter 11 Small Business Plan/Amended Small Business Plan (Form 425A)
Friday, April 18, 2025
555 555 misc Proposed Order Fri 04/18 9:27 AM
Proposed Order - Order Conditionally Approving Payment of March 2025 Invoice of Richman & Richman LLC Pursuant to the Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of R86 Liquidation Related [+]. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-] 220 Order on for Motion Interim Fee and Expense Reimbursement Procedure
Thursday, April 17, 2025
554 554 order Compensation Fri 04/18 8:35 AM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Ira Bodenstein, fees awarded: $46794.20, expenses awarded: $0.00. Signed on 4/17/2025. (Green, Ron)
Related: [-] 525