Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12410

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-bk-12416
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roti 1629 K Street, LLC
1629 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Michael P Richman
Richman & Richman LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 order Generic Order Wed 02/26 2:37 PM
Order - An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC to R86 1629 K Street, LLC. Signed on 2/25/2025 (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) Tue 09/10 7:53 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc List of Equity Security Holders Tue 09/10 7:47 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107/207) Tue 09/10 7:46 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum/206Sum) Tue 09/10 7:45 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Schedules Tue 09/10 7:45 PM
Schedules A / B,D,E / F,G,H,with Declaration Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sun 09/01 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 08/30 9:34 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear by Teams. Last day to object to dischargeability is 11/25/2024. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 order Joint Administration Wed 08/28 3:22 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 - Roti Restaurants, LLC with Member Cases(s) 24-12412 - Roti Restaurants Inc., 24-12422 - ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC, 24-12415 ROTI 1311 F Street LLC, 24-12416 ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC, 24-12418 ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Avenue LLC, 24-12427 ROTI Constitution Square LLC, 24-12428 -ROTI Square 54, LLC, 24-12425 ROTI 3 North Dearborn LLC Related [+]. Signed on 8/28/2024. (Armstead, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
9 9 trustee Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Tue 08/27 6:45 PM
Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng Related [+]. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-] 8 Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
8 8 trustee Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 08/27 6:44 PM
Notice of Appointment of Ira Bodenstein as Subchapter V Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 motion Joint Administration Mon 08/26 8:29 PM
Notice of Motion and Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 In re: Roti Restaurants, LLC with Member Case(s) 24-12412 In re: Roti Restaurants Inc.; 24-12415 In re: ROTI 1311 F Street, LLC; 24-12416 In re: ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC; 24-12418 In re: ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Ave LLC; 24-12422 In re: ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC; 24-12425 In re: ROTI 33 North Dearborn, LLC; 24-12427 In re: ROTI Constitution Square, LLC; 24-12428 In re: ROTI Square 54, LLC Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 08/26 10:26 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: To correct docket text. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
5 5 court Reassignment of Related Case Local Rule 1015 Mon 08/26 10:18 AM
Per Local Rule 1015-1 case related to case number 24-12410 and therefore assigned to Judge Donald R Cassling. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 4 Certification of Relatedness
4 4 misc Certification of Relatedness Mon 08/26 10:07 AM
Certification of Relatedness Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Mon 08/26 10:07 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC Related [+]. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 08/23 6:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12416 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48311034. Fee Amount $1738.00 (Richman, Michael) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a) Fri 08/23 5:21 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti 1629 K Street, LLC Chapter 11 SubchapterV Plan due by 11/21/2024. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]