Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12410

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-bk-12428
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Roti Square 54, LLC
2221 I Street NW
Washington, DC 20004
Represented By
Michael P Richman
Richman & Richman LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 order Generic Order Wed 02/26 3:28 PM
Order - An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of ROTI Square 54, LLC to R86 Square 54, LLC. Signed on 2/25/2025 (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) Tue 09/10 8:04 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc List of Equity Security Holders Tue 09/10 8:03 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107/207) Tue 09/10 8:03 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum/206Sum) Tue 09/10 8:02 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Schedules Tue 09/10 8:02 PM
Schedules A / B,D,E / F,G,H,with Declaration Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sun 09/01 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 08/30 9:30 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Appear by Teams. Last day to object to dischargeability is 11/25/2024. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 order Joint Administration Wed 08/28 3:28 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 - Roti Restaurants, LLC with Member Cases(s) 24-12412 - Roti Restaurants Inc., 24-12422 - ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC, 24-12415 ROTI 1311 F Street LLC, 24-12416 ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC, 24-12418 ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Avenue LLC, 24-12427 ROTI Constitution Square LLC, 24-12428 -ROTI Square 54, LLC, 24-12425 ROTI 3 North Dearborn LLC Related [+]. Signed on 8/28/2024. (Armstead, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
9 9 trustee Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Tue 08/27 6:56 PM
Subchapter V Trustee Verified Statement Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng Related [+]. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-] 8 Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
8 8 trustee Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 08/27 6:54 PM
Notice of Appointment of Ira Bodenstein as Subchapter V Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee Patrick S Layng. (Brief, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 motion Joint Administration Mon 08/26 8:38 PM
Notice of Motion and Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 24-12410 In re: Roti Restaurants, LLC with Member Case(s) 24-12412 In re: Roti Restaurants Inc.; 24-12415 In re: ROTI 1311 F Street, LLC; 24-12416 In re: ROTI 1629 K Street, LLC; 24-12418 In re: ROTI 1747 Pennsylvania Ave LLC; 24-12422 In re: ROTI 300 West Adams, LLC; 24-12425 In re: ROTI 33 North Dearborn, LLC; 24-12427 In re: ROTI Constitution Square, LLC; 24-12428 In re: ROTI Square 54, LLC Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 court Reassignment of Related Case Local Rule 1015 Mon 08/26 11:18 AM
Per Local Rule 1015-1 case related to case number 24-12410 and therefore assigned to Judge Donald R Cassling. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 4 Certification of Relatedness
5 5 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 08/26 11:14 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY : To correct docket text Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
4 4 misc Certification of Relatedness Mon 08/26 10:14 AM
Certification of Relatedness Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Mon 08/26 10:14 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Chapter 11 (Form 201A) Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC Related [+]. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 08/23 6:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12428 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48311034. Fee Amount $1738.00 (Richman, Michael) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a) Fri 08/23 5:54 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Michael P Richman on behalf of Roti Square 54, LLC Chapter 11 SubchapterV Plan due by 11/21/2024. (Richman, Michael)
Related: [-]