WATSON v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04468 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2024 4:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
BATTY FAYE WATSON
906 Buffalo Crk
West Hamlin, WV 25571 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/28 7:55 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (amas) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/27 9:54 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4468. (sbt) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 08/26 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17699799.), filed by BATTY FAYE WATSON.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |