STEELE v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04493 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
100 COLLEGE ROAD WEST
PRINCETON, NJ 08540 |
|
Plaintiff
TINA STEELE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/28 10:56 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4493. (tjd) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/27 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/2024. (ahf) |
|
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/27 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17702101.), filed by TINA STEELE.(ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |