GONZALEZ v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04507 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER MORALES GONZALEZ
902 South Manhattan Place Apt 1
Los Angeles, CA 90019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/28 9:39 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/28/24 (JL) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/28/2024) (jl) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/28 9:19 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4507. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/27 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BPAEDC-17703408.), filed by JENNIFER MORALES GONZALEZ.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |