BEST v. NOVO NORDISK, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04508 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
SHEREE BEST
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/29 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC.. (amas) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/28 9:21 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4508. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/27 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17703450.), filed by SHEREE BEST.(RUANE, SARAH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet of Sharee Best, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Attachment to CCS, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form of Sharee Best |