TINSLEY v. NOVO NORDISK A/S
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04510 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Plaintiff
KARETHA TINSLEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/29 6:42 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S. (rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/28 9:27 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4510. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
45
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 08/27 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NOVO NORDISK A/S ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17703502.), filed by KARETHA TINSLEY.(RUANE, SARAH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet of Karetha Tinsley, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Attachment to CCS, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form of Karetha Tinsley |