HAWK v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04536 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 4:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
TUDY HAWK
295 Wall St.
Hummelstown, PA 17036 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/03 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: counsel on 9/3/24. (mbh) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
42
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/30 5:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, filed by TUDY HAWK.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/29 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/29/24. (mbh) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 08/28 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17706356.), filed by TUDY HAWK.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 08/28 4:17 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4536. (sbt) |