McCARROLL v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04668 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 04, 2024 6:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
KAYLA MARIE McCARROLL
41233 Holland Rd
Ponchatoula, LA 70454 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/06 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (amas) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 09/05 9:51 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-4668. (sbt) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 09/04 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17719429.), filed by KAYLA MARIE McCARROLL.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |