HAYS v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04694 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 1:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
RANDALL HAYS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/06 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/6/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 09/06 6:44 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge Marston) Member Case. EDPA. Case number in EDPA: 24-4694 (nd) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
35
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 09/05 6:34 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17722899.), filed by RANDALL HAYS.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |