Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06003
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Howe Motorsports LLC
153 Hickory Hollow Drive
Crossville, TN 38555
Represented By
Howe Motorsports LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jim & Amanda Howe
dba Big Jim's Bonding 59 S. Main St., Ste 101
Crossville, TN 38555
Represented By
Jim & Amanda Howe
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Thu 04/24 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/22 9:14 AM
Notice of Hearing Signed on 4/22/2025 Related [+]. Pre Trial Conference hearing to be held on 7/11/2025 at 10:00 AM Telephonic Hearing for1 , (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 10:35 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants Jim & Amanda Howe, Howe Motorsports LLC (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance by Patrick John Geile Filed by Defendants Jim & Amanda Howe, Howe Motorsports LLC. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance by Lauren Bouvia Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Bouvia, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/18 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06003 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8529148. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/18 3:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on Howe Motorsports LLC 2/18/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/18 3:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jim & Amanda Howe 2/18/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 02/18 8:55 AM
Summons Issued on Jim & Amanda Howe Date Issued 2/18/2025, Answer Due 3/20/2025; Howe Motorsports LLC Date Issued 2/18/2025, Answer Due 3/20/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/17 7:18 PM
Adversary case 25-06003 13 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Howe Motorsports LLC, Jim & Amanda Howe. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons