Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:23-bk-00191
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2024
Claims Deadline:Aug 21, 2023
Converted:Aug 14, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:Nov 27, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HMH Construction, LLC
2501 E State Avenue Suite 110
Meridian, ID 83642
Represented By
D Blair Clark
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy R. Kurtz
Chapter 7 Trustee PO Box 956
Boise, ID 83702
Represented By
Timothy R. Kurtz
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724
Represented By
Andrew Seth Jorgensen
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2025 9:09 PM MDT
Thursday, April 20, 2023
1 1 24 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/20 12:53 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by HMH Construction, LLC Employee Income Records due 05/4/2023. Schedule A/B due 05/4/2023. Schedule D due 05/4/2023. Schedule E/F due 05/4/2023. Schedule G due 05/4/2023. Schedule H due 05/4/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/4/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/4/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 05/4/2023. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/18/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 08/18/2023. (Clark, D)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Thu 04/20 12:54 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by D. Blair Clark 1367 Filed by Debtor HMH Construction, LLC. (Clark, D)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 04/20 1:26 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor HMH Construction, LLC. (Clark, D)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Signature page(s) Thu 04/20 1:27 PM
Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor HMH Construction, LLC Related [+]. (Clark, D)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
5 5 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 04/20 1:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-00191 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8113408. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1