Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06006
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Newberry Development LLC
2482 E. Cyanite Drive
Meridian, ID 83642
Represented By
Newberry Development LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/23 9:00 AM
Summons Service Executed on Newberry Development LLC 3/7/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 notice Notice Mon 04/21 9:11 AM
Notice of No Contest Filed by Defendant Newberry Development LLC. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/21 8:04 AM
Summons Service Executed on Newberry Development LLC 3/7/2025 (Jaderholm, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:48 AM
Notice of Appearance by Lauren Bouvia Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Bouvia, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 3:26 PM
Notice of Appearance by Patrick John Geile Filed by Defendant Newberry Development LLC. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/04 10:14 AM
Summons Issued on Newberry Development LLC; c/o Dale Newberry Date Issued 3/4/2025, Answer Due 4/3/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Mon 03/03 10:54 AM
Summons (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/18 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06006 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8529148. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 02/18 9:33 AM
Summons Issued on Newberry Development LLC Date Issued 2/18/2025, Answer Due 3/20/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/17 7:32 PM
Adversary case 25-06006 13 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Newberry Development LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons