Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06008
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Schwab
1044 N 950 W
American Fork, UT 84003
Represented By
Scott Schwab
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:53 AM
Notice of Appearance by Lauren Bouvia Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Bouvia, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 misc Acceptance of Service Tue 03/11 10:08 AM
Acceptance of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz Related [+]. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/04 10:24 AM
Summons Issued on Scott Schwab Date Issued 3/4/2025, Answer Due 4/3/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Mon 03/03 10:53 AM
Summons (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/18 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06008 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8529148. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 02/18 9:47 AM
Summons Issued on Scott Schwab Date Issued 2/18/2025, Answer Due 3/20/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/17 7:39 PM
Adversary case 25-06008 13 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Scott Schwab. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons