Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06009
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Odom
2593 E. Lodge Trail Dr.
Meridian, ID 83642
Represented By
John Odom
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment Order Sun 04/27 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment Order Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 order Judgment Fri 04/25 9:10 AM
Default Judgment and Order Entered in favor of Plaintiff and against John Odom. For the amount of $ 14,939,615.88. Signed on 4/25/2025. (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/15 2:41 PM
DEFAULT IN THIS ACTION, THE DEFENDANT(S), John Odom having been regularly served with process and having failed to appear and answer the Plaintiffs complaint on file herein, and the time allowed by law for answering having expired, the default of the said Defendant(s) is hereby duly entered into law. Stephen W. Kenyon, Clerk of Court This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry of Default for this case. No document is attached. (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 motion Application for Clerks Default Mon 04/14 11:18 AM
Application for Clerks Default Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
6 6 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/14 11:17 AM
Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:42 AM
Notice of Appearance by Lauren Bouvia Filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz. (Bouvia, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/19 2:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on John Odom 2/19/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 02/19 10:05 AM
Summons Issued on John Odom Date Issued 2/19/2025, Answer Due 3/21/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/18 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06009 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8529148. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 5:00 PM
Adversary case 25-06009 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against John Odom. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 2 pgs Cover Sheet
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons