Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06017
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Damie Lasater
649 W Christopher Street
Meridian, ID 83642
Represented By
Damie Lasater
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/18 3:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Damie Lasater 4/18/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:16 AM
Summons Issued on Damie Lasater Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06017 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 11:15 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 10:24 AM
Adversary case 25-06017 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Damie Lasater. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adv Coversheet
Att: 2 Summons