Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06018
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Turley
448 E 780 N
Orem, UT 84097
Represented By
Joseph Turley
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/18 3:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Joseph Turley 4/18/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:26 AM
Summons Issued on Joseph Turley Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06018 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 10:44 AM
Adversary case 25-06018 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Joseph Turley. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adv Coversheet
Att: 2 Summons