Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06024
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Chase Bank USA, N.A.
contact info
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
JPMorgan Chase & Co
contact info
Defendant
Chase Bankcard LLC
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Chase Bankcard LLC
contact info
Defendant
Chase Bankcard Services Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Chase Bankcard Services Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on JPMorgan Chase & Co 4/22/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 3:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bankcard LLC 4/22/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 3:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bank USA, N.A. 4/22/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 10:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bankcard Services Inc 4/21/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:56 AM
Summons Issued on Chase Bank USA, N.A. Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025; Chase Bankcard LLC Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025; Chase Bankcard Services Inc Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025; JPMorgan Chase & Co Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06024 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 1:58 PM
Adversary case 25-06024 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co, Chase Bankcard LLC, Chase Bankcard Services Inc. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adv Coversheet
Att: 2 Summons