Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06025
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Barclays Bank Delaware
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
Barclays Bank Delaware
contact info
Defendant
Barclays Credit Corporation
3500 S Dupont Hwy
Dover, DE 19901
Represented By
Barclays Credit Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC
1305 12th Ave Rd
Nampa, ID 83686
Represented By
Barclays Bank PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on Barclays Credit Corporation 4/22/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 3:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Barclays Bank PLC 4/22/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 10:06 AM
Summons Service Executed on Barclays Bank Delaware 4/21/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:59 AM
Summons Issued on Barclays Bank Delaware Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025; Barclays Bank PLC Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025; Barclays Credit Corporation Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06025 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 2:17 PM
Adversary case 25-06025 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Barclays Bank Delaware, Barclays Credit Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adv Coversheet
Att: 2 Summons