Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06027
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kalamata Capital Group, LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
Kalamata Capital Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 10:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kalamata Capital Group, LLC 4/21/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 11:35 AM
Summons Issued on Kalamata Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06027 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 10:59 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Corrective Entry Thu 04/17 9:13 AM
Corrective Action: It appears the cover sheet has been filed as a fillable form, counsel to refile as a PDF. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 4/22/2025. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy R. Kurtz
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 1:03 PM
Adversary case 25-06027 91 (Declaratory judgment): Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Kalamata Capital Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adv Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons