Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06028
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alva Advance, LLC
1111 Brickell Ave STE 2725
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Alva Advance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 9:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on Alva Advance, LLC 4/21/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 11:42 AM
Summons Issued on Alva Advance, LLC Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06028 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/17 11:00 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/16 1:11 PM
Adversary case 25-06028 91 (Declaratory judgment): Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Alva Advance, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adv Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons