Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06035
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
BMT Capital Group, Inc.
Platinum Registered Agents 99 W. Hawthorne Ste 408
Valley Stream, NY 11580
Represented By
BMT Capital Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/22 10:08 AM
Summons Service Executed on BMT Capital Group, Inc. 4/21/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/21 11:03 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 04/21 10:10 AM
Summons Issued on BMT Capital Group, Inc. Date Issued 4/21/2025, Answer Due 5/21/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 3:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06035 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8574175. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 3:23 PM
Adversary case 25-06035 91 (Declaratory judgment): Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against BMT Capital Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adv Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons