Pergament, as Chapter 7 Trustee v. Carryl
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:15-ap-08131 |
Nature of Suit | 31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Maureen R. Carryl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc A Pergament, as Chapter 7 Trustee
400 Garden City Plaza, Suite 403
Gardent City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 07/01 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-8131 Closed (sld) |
||
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Approving Stipulation
Thu 02/25 3:05 PM
Order Approving the Settlement Between the Trustee, the Estate and Maureen R. Carryl and the Court shall retain jurisdiction with respect to all matters arising from or related to the implementation of this Order. , Granting Motion To Authorize/Direct Signed on 2/25/2016. (ymm) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 02/09 10:06 AM
Hearing Held; - Appearance(s) by Marc Pergament - DISMISSAL ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED (ymills) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 02/09 10:07 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance(s) by Marc A Pergament MOTION GRANTED - SUBMIT ORDER (ymills) |
||
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Approve Stipulation
Wed 12/30 3:01 PM
Motion to Approve Stipulation approving the Stipulation of Settlement between the Estate and Maureen R. Carryl whereby Ms. Carryl consents to the sale of the Debtors real property and the division of the net proceeds whereby Maureen Carryl shall receive fifty (50%) percent of the net proceeds , Motion to Authorize/Direct authorizing the Trustee to execute all documents necessary to effectuate the settlement of this adversary proceeding Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Marc A Pergament, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation in Support | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit s of Service | ||
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Fri 12/04 12:03 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from to February 9, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Marc A Pergament, as Chapter 7 Trustee (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP)
Tue 12/01 3:57 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance(s) by Marc Pergament - MOTION MARKED OFF AS SATISFIED, SO ORDERED BY /s/ ALAN S. TRUST. ENDORSED ON CALENDAR DATED 12/1/15. (THIS IS A TEXT ORDER, NO DOCUMENT IS ATTACHED.) STATUS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 2/9/16 AT 9:30 AM - LETTER TO BE FILED (ymills) |
||
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Case Owned)
Fri 01/15 11:25 AM
Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY (ymm) |
||
Wednesday, November 11, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 11/12 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 11/11/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Show Cause Re: Lack of Prosecution
Mon 11/09 10:13 AM
Order to Show Cause to Dismiss Case for Failure to Prosecute. If no one appears at the hearing, or if Plaintiff does not provide an adequate reason for no action having been taken in this adversary since its commencement, theadversary proceeding will be dismissed without further notice. . Signed on 11/6/2015 Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/1/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (sld) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Wed 09/30 9:43 AM
Stipulation Order by and between Attorneys for Plaintiff and Attorneys for Defendant Further Extending Defendant's Time to response to Complaint. Answer Due 10/31/2015. Defendant hereby waives any defenses regarding service of process. It is further ORDERED, that absent a hearing on notice and for good cause shown, the Court will not consider any further extensions of time within which Defendant may answer the complaint. SO ORDERED. Related document(s)17 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Defendant Maureen R. Carryl. Signed on 9/29/2015 (ssw) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Mon 09/28 9:58 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to further extend Defendant's time to answer or move herein through and including October 31, 2015 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl . (Ackerman, Neil) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Mon 08/10 2:00 PM
Stipulation and Order between plaintiff and defendant that the time for the Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is further extended through and including September 18, 2015. The Defendant waives any defenses regarding service of process. Answer Due 9/18/2015. Signed on 8/10/2015 (sld) Modified on 8/10/2015 (sld) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Mon 08/10 10:58 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between trustee/plaintiff and Defendant to further extend Defendant's time to answer or move through and including September 18, 2015 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl . (Ackerman, Neil) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 08/10 2:10 PM
Maureen R. Carryl Answer Deadline Reset for 9/18/2015 (sld) |
||
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Tue 06/30 11:52 AM
Stipulation and Order between plaintiff and defendant that that the time for the Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed inthe above-referenced adversary proceeding is extended through and including August 15, 2015. The Defendant waives any defenses regarding service ofprocess. Answer Due 8/15/2015. Signed on 6/30/2015 (sld) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Mon 06/29 10:13 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to to further extend Defendant's time to answer or move through and including AUgust 15, 2015 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl. (Ackerman, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Time to File Answer
Tue 06/23 11:13 AM
Stipulation and Order between plaintiff and defendant that that the time for the Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed inthe above-referenced adversary proceeding is extended to and including June 19, 2015. The Defendant hereby waives any defenses regarding service ofprocess. Answer Due 6/19/2015. Signed on 6/23/2015 (sld) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Tue 06/23 8:46 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to extend Defendant;s time to answer or move through and including 6/30/15 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl . (Ackerman, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
10 | 10 Stipulation and Order between plaintiff and defendant that the time for the Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed inthe above-referenced adversary proceeding is extended to and including June 19, 2015. the Defendant hereby waives any defenses regarding service ofprocess. Answer Due 6/19/2015. Signed on 6/9/2015 (sld) | |
9 | 9 Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Time to File an Answer to the Complaint Through and Including June 19, 2015 Filed by Neil H Ackerman on behalf of Maureen R. Carryl (Ackerman, Neil) | |
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8 2 pgs Letter advising of a negotiated settlement. Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Marc A Pergament, as Chapter 7 Trustee (Pergament, Marc) | |
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7 Stipulation and Order between plaintiff and defendant that the time for the Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed inthe above-referenced adversary proceeding is extended to and including June 5, 2015. The Defendant waives any defenses regarding service of process. Answer Due 6/5/2015. Signed on 6/1/2015 (sld) | |
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to further extend Defendant's time to answer or move through and including June 5, 2015 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl . (Ackerman, Neil) | |
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs Stipulation and Order by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Time for Defendant Maureen R. Carryl to File Answer. Answer Due 5/26/2015 . Signed on 5/11/2015 (srm) | |
4 | 4 2 pgs Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff/Trustee and Defendant to extend time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint through and including 5/26/15 Filed by Maureen R. Carryl . (Ackerman, Neil) | |
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
3 | 3 2 pgs Summons Served on Maureen R. Carryl 4/13/2015 and these additional parties: Office of the United States Trustee . (Pergament, Marc) | |
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Maureen R. Carryl Answer Due: 5/11/2015 (sld) | |
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 3 pgs Adversary case 8 15-08131 Complaint by Marc A Pergament against Maureen R. Carryl. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))). (Pergament, Marc) | |
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |