Jaffee v. Carryl
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:15-ap-08159 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Rudolph C. Carryl
43 Chestnut Hill Drive
Upper Brookville, NY 11771 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Jaffee
80 Broad Street 5 Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/30 2:33 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-8159 Closed (ssw) |
||
Saturday, October 17, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sun 10/18 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/17/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Generic Order
Thu 10/15 10:13 AM
Ordered that pursuant Bankruptcy Rule 1001 and 11 U.S.C. section 105(a), this Adversary Proceeding is hereby administratively closed. . Signed on 10/14/2015 (ssw) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 10/08 2:59 PM
Hearing Held; |
||
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sat 10/03 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/02/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Generic Order
Wed 09/30 9:28 AM
Order to voluntarily waive discharge. . Signed on 9/29/2015 (jaf) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement
Thu 09/24 1:04 PM
Statement Re: Waiver of Discharge Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) |
|
Sunday, September 20, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue Hearing
Sun 09/20 8:34 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Pre-Trial as Per Prior Pre-Trial Filed by B. Lane Hasler on behalf of Robert Jaffee. (Hasler, B.) Modified on 9/21/2015 removed hearing date and time scheduled from hearing held entry. (amp) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Tue 09/15 3:27 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by B. Lane Hasler and Scott Schneider - Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/06/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Mon 08/10 3:51 PM
Statement Jurisdiction Statement Filed by B. Lane Hasler on behalf of Robert Jaffee (Hasler, B.) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
More Definite Statement
Fri 08/07 8:32 AM
Motion for More Definite Statement Filed by B. Lane Hasler on behalf of Robert Jaffee. (Hasler, B.) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Joint Discovery Control Plan
Tue 08/04 11:32 AM
Joint Discovery Control Plan Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 06/25 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 06/24/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order (Judge Trust Cases Only)
Mon 06/22 3:54 PM
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before August 16, 2015. Joint Discovery Control Plan due by 8/3/2015. Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a due by 8/3/2015. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/15/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Signed on 6/22/2015. (ssw) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
3 | 3 3 pgs Answer to Complaint Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) | |
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Rudolph C. Carryl Answer Due: 5/22/2015 (ssw) | |
1 | 1 4 pgs Adversary case 8 15-08159 Complaint by Robert JAFFEE, Rudolph C. Carryl against Rudolph C. Carryl. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)). (Hasler, B.) | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Adversary Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Summons 1 | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Summons 2 | ||
Receipt of Complaint(8 15-08159 ast) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13352437. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |