Au et al v. Carryl
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-70282
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:15-ap-08164 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 6:58 PM EDT |
Defendant
Rudolph C. Carryl
43 Chestnut Hill Drive
Upper Brookville, NY 11771 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isabel Au
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Au
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tung Au
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 01/04 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-8164 Closed (dhc) |
||
Saturday, October 17, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sun 10/18 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/17/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Generic Order
Thu 10/15 11:35 AM
Ordered, that pursuant Bankruptcy Rule 1001 and 11 U.S.C. section 105(a), this Adversary Proceeding is hereby administratively closed. . Signed on 10/14/2015 (ssw) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 10/08 3:00 PM
Hearing Held; |
||
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 07/16 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 07/15/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order (Judge Trust Cases Only)
Mon 07/13 4:56 PM
Initial Scheduling Order. Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before September 8, 2015. Signed on 7/13/2015. Joint Discovery Control Plan due by 9/22/2015. Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a due by 9/22/2015. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (dnb) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4 3 pgs Answer to Complaint Filed by Scott R Schneider on behalf of Rudolph C. Carryl (Schneider, Scott) | |
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
3 | 3 12 pgs Summons Served on Rudolph C. Carryl 4/28/2015 and these additional parties: Scott Schneider, Esq. , with proof of service . (Mael, Bruce) | |
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Rudolph C. Carryl Answer Due: 5/26/2015 (dnb) | |
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 Adversary case 8 15-08164 Complaint by Thomas Au, Tung Au, Isabel Au against Rudolph C. Carryl. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)). (Mael, Bruce) | |
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet | ||
Receipt of Complaint(8 15-08164 ast) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13355397. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |