NNN Doral Court 9, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-24228
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-24228
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-24241 |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 08, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NNN Doral Court 9, LLC
97 Minuteman Cir
Allentown, NJ 08501-1859 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 60 seconds ago |
Sunday, December 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/25 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/22 10:18 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
27 | 27
order
Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11]
Fri 12/22 10:17 AM
Final Decree . (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
trustee
UST Notice of No Objection to Entry of Final Decree (Ch 11) [PAPERLESS]
Thu 12/21 10:22 AM
The debtor in the above case has filed a Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree. The debtor has certified that the case has been fully administered. Based upon the Debtor's Final Report, the United States Trustee has no objection to the Court granting the Debtor's Motion for Final Decree. The Debtor will remain liable for United States Trustee Quarterly Fees for each calendar quarter (or portion thereof) through the date the Final Decree is entered in this case. The United States Trustee reserves the right to seek to have the Final Decree vacated should any United States Trustee Quarterly Fees remain unpaid through date of closing by the court. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Schneiderman, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Final Report of Estate (Ch 11)
Fri 12/15 11:29 AM
Final Report of Estate and Motion for Final Decree Closing Case Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal . Deadline for US Trustee to Object to Final Report: 01/16/2018. (Mukamal, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 02/10 10:42 AM
Notice of Filing of assigned Employer Identification Number (EIN) for NNN Doral Court 9, LLC - 47-4824327 , Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Mukamal, Barry) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 12/11 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 12/10/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
Tue 12/08 10:37 AM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Trustee's Plan of Liquidation. Final Report of Estate Due: 2/8/2016. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
notice
UST Notice Appointing Trustee
Fri 09/25 2:38 PM
Notice Appointing Barry E Mukamal as CHAPTER 11 Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST15, MAF) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS]
Tue 09/22 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appoint Trustee and Setting Status Conference on October 7, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. at the United States Bankruptcy Court, C. Clyde Atkins U.S.Courthouse, 301 N. Miami Avenue, Courtroom 8, Miami, Florida, 33128. (Lead Case 15-24228 (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/28 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Jeremy D Evans . (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
attydoc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Wed 08/26 4:53 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Jeremy D Evans . (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements
Thu 08/20 7:39 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] Amended List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Local Form 4 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 08/20 8:08 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 15-24241 LMI) [misc,schsia] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25382241. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, August 16, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 08/17 1:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
attydoc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Fri 08/14 12:49 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Jeremy D Evans . (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
14 | 14
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Fri 08/14 7:51 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 9/11/2015 at 01:30 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 11/10/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 12/10/2015. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/13 12:19 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC . (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Joint Administration Order
Tue 08/11 10:43 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-bk-24228 with Member Case 15-bk-24241-LMI (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 08/10 4:38 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-24233 15-24236 15-24237 15-24238 15-24239 15-24241 15-24242 15-24243 15-24245 15-24246 15-24247 15-24248 15-24249 15-24250 15-24252 15-24253 15-24254 15-24256 15-24258 15-24259 15-24261 15-24262 15-24263 15-24264 15-24265 15-24266 15-24268 15-24269 into Lead Case 15-24228 Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Aaronson, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
order
Transfer Case (Intra-District) Order
Mon 08/10 10:57 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Emergency Motion To Transfer Case to Judge Isicoff for Joint Administration with Related Bankruptcy Cases. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Sunday, August 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/10 1:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/09/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, August 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Transfer Case (Intra-District)
Sat 08/08 4:18 PM
Emergency Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division Judge Isicoff Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 08/07 3:25 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 8/14/2015]. Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing due 8/14/2015. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/20/2015. Summary of Schedules due 8/20/2015. Schedule A due 8/20/2015. Schedule B due 8/20/2015. Schedule D due 8/20/2015. Schedule E due 8/20/2015. Schedule F due 8/20/2015. Schedule G due 8/20/2015. Schedule H due 8/20/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 8/20/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 8/20/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 8/20/2015]. (Catala, Nilda) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 08/06 11:58 PM
Notice of Filing Explanation for Lack of Tax Identification Number , Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC . (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 08/06 6:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Tamara D McKeown Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (McKeown, Tamara) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 08/06 6:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Jeremy D Evans Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Evans, Jeremy) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 08/06 6:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Geoffrey S. Aaronson Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Aaronson, Geoffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 08/06 5:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor NNN Doral Court 9, LLC. (Schantz, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Thu 08/06 5:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Schantz, Lawrence) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 08/06 5:20 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-24241 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25258500. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |