NNN Doral Court 3, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-24228 |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 16, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 08, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NNN Doral Court 3, LLC
6278 N Federal Hwy PMB #449
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308-1916 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Barry E Mukamal
1 SE 3 Avenue Ste 2150 Box 158
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
1. | Doral Court office building files Chapter 11 bankruptcy to stay looming foreclosure (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/13/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |