Banyan Street Capital, LLC v. NNN Doral Court LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-24228
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-24228
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-01587 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 37, LLC
10 Holmes Road
Lexington, MA 02420 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 24, LLC
101 E San Marino Avenue
Alhambra, CA 91801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 26, LLC
190 Wilking Way
Sonoma, CA 95476 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 30, LLC
23912 Capistrano Ct.
Valencia, CA 91355 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 31, LLC
510 E Rustic Road
Santa Monica, CA 90402 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 32, LLC
PO Box 221076
Sacramento, CA 95822 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 34, LLC
3620 Cape Center Drive
Fayetteville, NC 28304 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 35 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 36, LLC
1200 Kimberly Drive
Raleigh, NC 27609 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 20, LLC
9805 Jolly Court
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 39, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 40, LLC
2363 Anderson Hill Street
Marriottsville, MD 21104 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 41, LLC
15 W. Mountain View Street Suite 9
Long Beach, CA 90805 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 42, LLC
46-168 Hilinama Street
Kaneohe, HI 33166 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 43, LLC
21 W 481 Fairway Avenue
Glen Ellyn, IL 60137 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 44, LLC
316 N. Country Club Drive
Lake Worth, FL 33462 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 45, LLC
316 N. Country Club Drive
Lake Worth, FL 33462 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 18, LLC
50 East South Temple #400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 3, LLC
6278 N. Federal Highway PMB #449
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 4, LLC
7382 Hwy 108 E
Mill Spring, NC 28756 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 5, LLC
505 E Jackson Street, Suite 202
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 6, LLC
7329 Bent Bow Trail
Chanhassen, MN 55317 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 7, LLC
7329 Bent Bow Trail
Chanhassen, MN 55317 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 8, LLC
235 San Julian Avenue
Santa Barbara, CA 93109 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 9, LLC
97 Minuteman Circle
Allentown, NJ 08501 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 10, LLC
97 Minuteman Circle
Allentown, NJ 08501 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 11, LLC
1002 S. Mt. Carmel Road
Brandon, FL 33511 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 13, LLC
385 Primrose Walk
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 14, LLC
3591 W 7900 S
Spanish Fork, UT 84660 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 15, LLC
545 S. Ft. Lauderdale Beach Blvd #603
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33316 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN Doral Court 16, LLC
1963 Sir Lancelot Circle
Saint Cloud, FL 34772 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Banyan Street Capital, LLC
Stearns Weaver Miller, et al. 150 W. Flagler Street Suite 2200
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/14 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1587 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/06 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/05/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/03 12:47 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
attydoc
Notice of Filing
Tue 11/17 4:28 PM
Notice of Filing Motions to Approve Settlements with Banyan Street Capital LLC and Doral Court Debt Holdings, LLC, Including Bar Orders by Attorney David Samole Esq. (Samole, David) |
|
Saturday, November 07, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 11/08 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 11/07/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice to Withdraw Document
Fri 11/06 5:24 AM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Respondent NNN Realty Investors, Inc. . (Hough, Julie) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 11/05 12:57 PM
Report of Judicial Conference Facilitator . (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Mon 10/19 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Julie E Hough . (Hough, Julie) |
|
25 | 25
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 10/19 7:25 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 10/17 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/16/2015. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Quash
Fri 10/16 7:54 PM
Motion to Quash and Objection to Plaintiff Banyan Street Capital, LLCs First Request for Production, First Requests for Admissions, and First Set of Interrogatories to NNN Doral Court, LLC (the Discovery) issued on September 29, 2015, and Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Discovery Filed by Respondent NNN Realty Investors, Inc. (Hough, Julie) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 10/16 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/15/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/14 3:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry Mukamal . (Throckmorton, Charles) |
|
20 | 20
order
Continue Hearing Order
Wed 10/14 7:30 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Continue Trial On: (1 Notice of Removal). Trial set for 11/18/2015, 11/19/2015, and 11/20/2015 at 09:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Tue 10/13 12:16 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney David Samole Esq . (Samole, David) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order (Generic)
Tue 10/13 11:40 AM
Order Directing Parties To Judicial Settlement Conference . (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
Sunday, October 11, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 10/12 2:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/11/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 10/09 3:43 PM
Order Setting Judicial Settlement Conference. Conference will be Conducted on November 2, 2015 and Will Begin at 9:30 a.m. at the Chambers of the Honorable Robert A. Mark, U.S Bankruptcy Court, C. Clyde Atkins United States Courthouse, 301 North Miami Avenue, Room 417, Miami, Florida 33128 . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Withdraw Document
Tue 10/06 4:29 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Trustee Barry Mukamal . (Samole, David) |
|
14 | 14
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Tue 10/06 4:18 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney David Samole Esq . (Samole, David) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/06 3:56 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry Mukamal . (Samole, David) |
|
12 | 12
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Tue 10/06 1:05 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Continue Hearing
Tue 10/06 12:57 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Notice of Removal)] October 19 -21 Trial Filed by Trustee Barry Mukamal (Throckmorton, Charles) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Tue 10/06 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Charles W Throckmorton Esq Filed by Trustee Barry Mukamal. (Throckmorton, Charles) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 09/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/25/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Thu 09/24 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Drew M Dillworth . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Shorten Time Order
Wed 09/23 9:52 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Requests (Catala, Nilda) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Shorten Time
Mon 09/21 1:11 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Banyan Street Capital, LLC (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Motion
Mon 09/21 1:08 PM
Motion to Implement Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiff Banyan Street Capital, LLC (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Fri 09/11 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 09/10/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 09/09 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Drew M Dillworth . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Tue 09/08 12:47 PM
Notice of Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/02 5:27 PM
Notice of Removal of claims and causes of action asserted in Complaint for Specific Performance, filed on June 16, 2015, and Defendants Counterclaim, filed on July 2, 2015, in Case No. 12-45266 CA 09, pending in the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida, by Plaintiff Banyan Street Capital, LLC [Fee Amount $350] Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Att: 1 77 pgs Exhibit 1, Part 1 - Banyan Motion for Leave to File Complaint | ||
Att: 2 123 pgs Exhibit 1, Part 2 - Banyan Motion for Leave to File Complaint | ||
Att: 3 54 pgs Exhibit 1, Part 3 - Banyan Motion for Leave to File Complaint | ||
Att: 4 72 pgs Exhibit 2, Part 1 - Banyan Complaint | ||
Att: 5 121 pgs Exhibit 2, Part 2 - Banyan Complaint | ||
Att: 6 43 pgs Exhibit 2, Part 3 - Banyan Complaint | ||
Att: 7 33 pgs Exhibit 3 - Defendants Answer and Affirmative Defenses | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4 - Banyan Reply to Affirmative Defenses, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaim | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 5, Part 1 - Banyan Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 5, Part 2 - Banyan Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 5, Part 3 - Banyan Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 6 - Defendant Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 09/02 5:29 PM
Receipt of Notice of Removal 15-01587 LMI) [cmp,ntcrmvl] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25494730. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |